MD HB979 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to include in a certain report certain statistics related to the cost of living of inmates at certain facilities; and requiring the Division of Correction to include in a certain report regarding Maryland Correctional Enterprises certain statistics regarding the race, age, and sex of certain inmates, disaggregated by job classification and wage scale.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Services – Inmate Cost–of–Living Report – Maryland Correctional Enterprises Diversity Report

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (127-6)
2020-03-11HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-11HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Correctional Services3207(n/a)See Bill Text
Correctional Services3509(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback