MD HB979 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that a certain insurer that offers or sells a travel insurance policy is required to pay a certain premium tax on certain premiums paid by certain persons; requiring travel insurance to be classified and filed as inland marine insurance; specifying the state of residence for different types of policies; providing that eligibility and underwriting standards for travel insurance may be developed and provided based on certain travel protection plans and certain applicable provisions of law; etc.
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197 |
2018-04-03 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {547475/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {183892/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Commerce and Business
Communications
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Fees
Fire Protection
Fraud
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Places of Worship
Prices
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Time
Tourism
Transportation
Commerce and Business
Communications
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Fees
Fire Protection
Fraud
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Jurisdiction
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicles
Notices
Places of Worship
Prices
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Time
Tourism
Transportation