MD HB978 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 399
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, on or after July 1, 2021, pharmacy services administrative organizations to register with the Maryland Insurance Commissioner before providing certain services in the State; requiring certain applicants to file an application on a certain form and pay a certain fee; providing for the expiration and renewal of certain registration; prohibiting certain pharmacy services administrative organizations from entering into certain contracts; providing that a certain notice from the Commissioner constitutes a certain waiver; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Insurance Administration - Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations - Regulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 399
2020-03-18HousePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-18HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17SenateFloor Amendment {507773/1 (Senator Kramer) Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-15SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (130-0)
2020-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {566988/1 Adopted
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB915 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 398

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Insurance152001(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance152002(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance152003(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance152004(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance152005(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance152006(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance152007(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance152008(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance152009(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance152010(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance152011(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance152012(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance152013(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance152014(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance152015(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance152016(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance152017(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance152018(n/a)See Bill Text
Insurance152019(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback