MD HB977 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Placing a moratorium on the application of the prevailing wage rate law to an elementary or secondary school constructed by or for a public body, the construction of which begins on or after October 1, 2022, and before the end of October 30, 2027, if the contract to perform the work was entered into on or after October 1, 2022, and before the end of October 30, 2027.
Title
Prevailing Wage Rate – Public School Construction – Moratorium
Sponsors
Del. Trent Kittleman [R] | Del. Joseph Boteler [R] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Del. Nino Mangione [R] |
Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. Charles Otto [R] | Del. April Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 17 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 17 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 17 | 214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |