MD HB977 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the termination date of specified provisions of law relating to an occupational disease presumption under workers' compensation law for Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission park police officers who contract Lyme disease under specified circumstances.
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission Park Police - Workers' Compensation - Lyme Disease Presumption - Repeal of Termination Date PG/MC 110-14
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-7) (Y: 125 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-7) (Y: 125 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 629 |
2014-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-7) |
2014-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Diseases
Law Enforcement
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Sunset
Workers' Compensation
Law Enforcement
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Sunset
Workers' Compensation