MD HB974 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Third Reading Passed (127-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "sexual abuse"; altering the statute of limitations in certain civil actions relating to child sexual abuse by providing that a certain action may be filed at any time; providing for the retroactive application of the Act to revive any action that was barred by the application of the period of limitations applicable before October 1, 2020, if the action is filed before October 1, 2022; and repealing a statute of repose for certain civil actions relating to child sexual abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations (Hidden Predator Act of 2020)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (127-0)
2020-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {332815/1 Adopted
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2017(n/a)See Bill Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings5117(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback