MD HB974 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB263
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Third Reading Passed (127-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Third Reading Passed (127-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "sexual abuse"; altering the statute of limitations in certain civil actions relating to child sexual abuse by providing that a certain action may be filed at any time; providing for the retroactive application of the Act to revive any action that was barred by the application of the period of limitations applicable before October 1, 2020, if the action is filed before October 1, 2022; and repealing a statute of repose for certain civil actions relating to child sexual abuse.
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Definition and Statute of Limitations (Hidden Predator Act of 2020)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-0) |
2020-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {332815/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB974 (Carry Over) 2020-03-14 - Third Reading Passed (127-0)
Subjects
Child Abuse and Neglect
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Family Law
Obscenity
Pornography
Prostitution
Sexual Offenses
Statutes of Limitation
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Family Law
Obscenity
Pornography
Prostitution
Sexual Offenses
Statutes of Limitation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 5 | 117 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |