MD HB973 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing certain minimum fines for certain traffic violations relating to the driver of a vehicle failing to stop or yield to certain pedestrian and bicycle traffic; altering the source of funds for the Pedestrian Safety Fund; and requiring the Secretary of Transportation, in administering the Fund, to prioritize enhancing the safety and quality of pedestrian and bicycle transportation near schools and school bus stops.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Violations Involving Pedestrians or Bicyclists - Penalties (Pedestrian Safety Act of 2020)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB815 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Subjects
Bicycles
Boundaries
Fines
Motor Vehicle Operation
Pedestrians
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Transportation, Department of
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Boundaries
Fines
Motor Vehicle Operation
Pedestrians
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Transportation, Department of
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 502.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 511 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 21 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |