MD HB972 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 542
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a holder of a Class 4 limited winery license to own or have under contract at least 20 acres of grapes or other fruit in cultivation for use in the production of wine in the State or to ensure that at least 51% of the ingredients used in the annual production of wine are grapes or other fruit grown in the State; authorizing the Secretary of Agriculture to grant a certain exemption; providing for the application of the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic Beverages - Class 4 Limited Winery Licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 542
2018-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-04-07HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
2018-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-27SenateFavorable with Amendments {324634/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-26SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-23SenateHearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-15SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {963593/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-02-23HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0972&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0972f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0972t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0972e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_542_hb0972e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0972_96359301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0972_32463401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0972.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0972_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0375.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0972_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0889.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1366.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback