MD HB972 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a transportation network application company to disclose specified information in writing to its transportation network operators; requiring a transportation network application company and any transportation network operator to maintain specified transportation network insurance in accordance with the Act; providing for the application of transportation network insurance to specified activities of a transportation network operator during specified periods under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Insurance - Transportation Network Insurance - Requirements and Coverage
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2015-03-04 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Accidents
Claims
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
For-Hire Driving
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Liability
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation
Utility Regulation
Claims
Disclosure
Electronic Commerce
For-Hire Driving
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Liability
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Prices
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation
Utility Regulation