MD HB971 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that the appropriate authority of a local pension system offer a special disability retirement allowance to certain members under certain circumstances; providing for the calculation of a special disability retirement allowance; exempting the appropriate authority of a local pension system from the requirements of the Act under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - House Floor - Sustained (0-140) (Y: 1 N: 141 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2018-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {934968/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-03-06HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback