MD HB967 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 628
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the placement and use of not more than two speed monitoring systems on Interstate 83 in Baltimore City; requiring that fines collected as a result of violations enforced by the speed monitoring systems be used to assist in covering the cost of roadway improvements on Interstate 83 in Baltimore City; requiring a warning notice be mailed instead of a citation for a violation recorded by the system during the first 90 days of operation; requiring certain signage and a real-time display of a driver's traveling speed; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems - Interstate 83

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 628
2021-04-12HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (95-41)
2021-04-12HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (35-11)
2021-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments {858370/1 Adopted
2021-04-09SenateMotion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Jennings) Rejected
2021-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments {858370/1
2021-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-23SenateHearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-03-22SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-22HouseThird Reading Passed (95-39)
2021-03-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {460912/1 Adopted
2021-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-02-15HouseHearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-02HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Courts and Judicial Proceedings7302(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation21809(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0967?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0967f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0967t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0967e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_628_hb0967e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0967_46091201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0007/hb0967_85837001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb0967_ent.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb0967_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0775.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1430.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1125.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback