MD HB966 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a local school system from charging a student a fee for enrollment in a summer school course if the student attends a school in the local school system, credit for the course is a high school graduation requirement, and the student has previously taken the course, but did not successfully complete or receive credit for the course.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools - Fees for Summer School Courses - Prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-1) (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading Passed (139-1)
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {765965/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback