MD HB963 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 391
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a holder of a license with an on-sale privilege in Harford County to keep certain records at the location designated in the license or another location in the county; requiring a certain license holder, on 5 days' notice, to make certain records available for inspection by the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County or a designee of the Board; requiring the Board to impose a certain fine under certain circumstances; and authorizing the Board to suspend a certain license under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - On-Sale License Record Keeping and Enforcement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 391
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (45-1)
2020-03-16SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-16SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-06SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (137-1)
2020-02-28HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-02-24HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB496 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 392

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages22102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages221904(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback