MD HB962 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing an assisted living program beer, wine, and liquor license in Harford County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to issue the license to a manager of an assisted living program, but no more than five ALP licenses to a person; authorizing the license holder to provide beer and wine for on-premises consumption by a resident or guest; authorizing the license holder to store liquor, prepare mixed drinks, and serve liquor or mixed drinks; specifying a license fee of $5,000; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Assisted Living Program License

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-04HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2020-02-28HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-02-24HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB373 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-13 - Referred Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages221001(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages22102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages221405(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages221602(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General191801(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback