MD HB961 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Adding bingo in Harford County to the list of home games that an individual may conduct in a common area of a residential property if the property is restricted to residents who are at least 55 years old.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harford County - Gaming - Home Games - Bingo

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (130-1)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {315567/1 Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government91C-01(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback