MD HB959 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 706
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 706
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City, when determining whether a license should be renewed and, if so, whether any conditions should be attached, to consider the performance of a license holder for the 4 years immediately before the date of the renewal application; prohibiting the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City or a certain license holder in the City from allowing a person under the age of 21 years to enter a certain establishment except under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – License Renewals and Adult Entertainment
Sponsors
Del. Nick Mosby [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Keith Haynes [D] |
Del. Stephanie Smith [D] | Del. Melissa Wells [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-2) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-2) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 706 |
2019-04-06 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-04-06 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-2) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {444734/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {133691/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Age of Majority
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Armed Forces
Baltimore City
License Commissioners, Boards of
Minors
Nudity and Sexual Displays
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Armed Forces
Baltimore City
License Commissioners, Boards of
Minors
Nudity and Sexual Displays