MD HB956 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the circumstances under which general contractors are jointly and severally liable for violations of the wage payment and collection law by subcontractors; prohibiting an obligation of contract right from being impaired by the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment - Wage Payment and Collection - General Contractor Liability

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB831 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-14 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor and Employment3507.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback