MD HB956 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing an individual or a corporation to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain costs incurred for an approved lead hazard reduction project for qualifying property located in Baltimore City; providing for the calculation of the credit; providing for the submission of proposals for lead hazard reduction projects to the Department of Housing and Community Development for approval; limiting to $250,000 the total amount of credits that the Department may approve for any fiscal year; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Lead Remediation Credit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateHearing 4/04 at 2:30 p.m.
2019-04-04SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2019-04-01SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed (130-0)
2019-03-28HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments {285960/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback