MD HB955 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a prohibition against possessing a snare trap in certain counties; and repealing a prohibition against using, selling, possessing, setting, placing, or maintaining a snare trap in Cecil County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Snare Traps – Prohibition Against Sale or Possession – Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-10HouseThird Reading Passed (137-1)
2020-03-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {550713/1 Adopted
2020-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Natural Resources10410(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback