MD HB955 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB579
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a prohibition against possessing a snare trap in certain counties; and repealing a prohibition against using, selling, possessing, setting, placing, or maintaining a snare trap in Cecil County.
Title
Snare Traps – Prohibition Against Sale or Possession – Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2020-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {550713/1 Adopted |
2020-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB955 (Carry Over) 2020-03-11 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Animals
Anne Arundel County
Birds
Cecil County
Counties
Evidence
Hunting and Fishing
Law Enforcement
Trapping
Anne Arundel County
Birds
Cecil County
Counties
Evidence
Hunting and Fishing
Law Enforcement
Trapping
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |