MD HB952 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Division of Land Acquisition in the Department of Planning to acquire the property known as the Fort Howard VA Campus if the federal government makes the entire parcel of property or any portion of the parcel available for sale or other transfer of title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Acquisition of the Fort Howard VA Campus Property

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations
2018-03-08HouseHearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-14HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-06HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback