MD HB952 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Division of Land Acquisition in the Department of Planning to acquire the property known as the Fort Howard VA Campus if the federal government makes the entire parcel of property or any portion of the parcel available for sale or other transfer of title.
Title
State Acquisition of the Fort Howard VA Campus Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Federal Government
Planning, Department of
Public Buildings and Facilities
Real Property
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Planning, Department of
Public Buildings and Facilities
Real Property
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials