MD HB951 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the manner in which the State Board of Elections is authorized to impose fees for the late filing of certain statements of contributions by persons doing public business; requiring certain persons who violate certain provisions of law requiring disclosure of contributions by persons doing public business to pay a civil penalty in accordance with certain provisions of the Act; prohibiting a certain penalty from exceeding $25,000 or imprisonment of up to 1 year or both; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Disclosure of Contributions by Persons Doing Public Business - Enforcement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 109 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (109-29)
2020-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {165163/1 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-05HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB759 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Senate Requests House Recede

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law14104(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law14107(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law14107.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law14107.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback