MD HB95 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adding a haul seine to the list of methods a person may use to fish in certain waters of the Severn River under certain circumstances; repealing certain provisions of law that restrict the length of a haul seine that a person may use in certain waters of Anne Arundel County; and authorizing a person to use a haul seine to fish in the waters of Anne Arundel County except under certain circumstances.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2020-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {760010/1 Adopted |
2020-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB162 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-15 - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Chesapeake Bay
Fish and Fishing
Gill Nets
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Time
Water
Weights and Measures
Chesapeake Bay
Fish and Fishing
Gill Nets
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Time
Water
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 4 | 713 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 4 | 714 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |