MD HB946 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 383
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a court, in determining whether the application of the child support guidelines would be unjust or inappropriate in a particular case to consider whether an obligor's monthly obligation would leave the obligor with a monthly actual income below 110% of the 2019 federal poverty level for an individual; authorizing the court to decline to establish a child support order under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Support - Guidelines

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 383
2020-03-16HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-14SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-14SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-14SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-06SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2020-03-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {262319/1 Adopted
2020-03-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB847 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 384

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Law12201(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law12202(n/a)See Bill Text
Family Law12204(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback