MD HB944 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing, from $7,500 to $10,000, the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain expenses paid or incurred by an individual that are attributable to the individual's donation of an organ; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Living Organ Donors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB651 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Tax - General10208(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback