MD HB943 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Community Development Administration in the Department of Housing and Community Development to administer a home buyer assistance program that assists current students and recent graduates of public institutions of higher education to receive certain low-interest mortgages for the purchase of homes near their schools; authorizing the Administration to administer community development projects known as the Live Near Your School program; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Development Administration – Live Near Your School Program – Establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-04-12SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-04-12SenateReferred Rules
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (135-4)
2021-04-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {680012/1 Adopted
2021-04-10HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2021-02-04HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-02HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Same As/Similar To

SB637 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Housing and Community Development4215.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Housing and Community Development4217(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback