MD HB943 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting to one time for each telephone number the number of times a telephone company may assess a fee to a customer for keeping certain telephone numbers unpublished; and authorizing a telephone company to assess the fee each time a customer changes the customer's telephone number.
Title
Telephone Companies - Unpublished Telephone Number - One-Time Charge
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {883095/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |