MD HB942 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 381
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying certain provisions of law pertaining to a certain reemployment earnings offset of a retirement allowance for certain retirees of the State Retirement and Pension System that are reemployed in certain positions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Retirement and Pension System - Reemployment Earnings Offset - Clarification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 381
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-16SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-16SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-12SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2020-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {494766/1 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2020-02-07HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB809 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 382

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Personnel and Pensions22406(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions23407(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions24405(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions25403(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions27406(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback