MD HB94 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the conditions under which the Maryland Water Quality Revolving Loan Fund may be used to guarantee, or purchase insurance for, bonds, notes, or other evidences of obligation issued by a local government under certain circumstances; and expanding the uses of the Fund to provide guarantees of certain similar revolving funds and various contracts or bonds that provide water quality benefits.
Title
Environment - Water Quality Revolving Loan Fund - Uses of Fund
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2021-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {720010/1 Adopted |
2021-02-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-10-30 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Bonds
Committees and Commissions
Environment
Environmental Health
Federal Government
Grants
Interest
Loans
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Pollution
Revenue and Taxes
Water
Committees and Commissions
Environment
Environmental Health
Federal Government
Grants
Interest
Loans
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Pollution
Revenue and Taxes
Water
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |