MD HB939 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 379
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a dental practice to be owned by a licensed dentist or a dental professional corporation; establishing that only a certain individual licensed by the State Board of Dental Examiners may take certain actions; prohibiting any person who is not a licensed dentist to direct, control, or interfere with the independent professional judgement of a dentist or dental hygienist regarding the care of a certain patient; prohibiting a licensed dentist from sharing revenues or splitting fees except under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Dental Examiners - Practice of Dentistry - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 379
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-12SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2020-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {916982/1 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-05HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB174 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 380

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health Occupations4101(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations4102(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations4103(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations4301(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations4315(n/a)See Bill Text
Health Occupations4509(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback