MD HB938 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Third Reading Passed 45-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Office of Home Energy Programs, in coordination with the United Way of Central Maryland and the Fuel Fund of Maryland, to establish the Power to the People Pilot Program on or before July 1, 2021, to expand access to the Critical Medical Needs Program; requiring the Pilot Program to provide training for certain individuals to serve as navigators under the Critical Medical Needs Program; requiring the United Way of Central Maryland to develop a certain screening intake process; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed 45-0 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed 45-0
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {157879/1 Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-03-16SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {423494/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB1024 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Human Services55A-08(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback