MD HB938 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB969
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Third Reading Passed 45-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-18 - Third Reading Passed 45-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Home Energy Programs, in coordination with the United Way of Central Maryland and the Fuel Fund of Maryland, to establish the Power to the People Pilot Program on or before July 1, 2021, to expand access to the Critical Medical Needs Program; requiring the Pilot Program to provide training for certain individuals to serve as navigators under the Critical Medical Needs Program; requiring the United Way of Central Maryland to develop a certain screening intake process; etc.
Title
Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program - Power to the People Pilot Program
Sponsors
Del. Ned Carey [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed 45-0 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed 45-0 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {157879/1 Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {423494/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB938 (Carry Over) 2020-03-18 - Third Reading Passed 45-0
SB1024 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
SB1024 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Community Facilities and Services
Energy
Energy Matters
Governor
Human Services, Department of
Job Training
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Employees
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Social Services - Generally
State Aid
Sunset
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Budgets
Community Facilities and Services
Energy
Energy Matters
Governor
Human Services, Department of
Job Training
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Employees
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Social Services - Generally
State Aid
Sunset
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Human Services | 5 | 5A-08 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |