MD HB937 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from providing household goods moving services in the State unless the person is registered as a household goods mover under the Act; requiring a person to submit to the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation a certain application and a certain fee to apply for a certain registration; requiring a household goods mover to pay an annual registration fee established by the Department; establishing that a violation of the Act is a misdemeanor and on conviction a violator is subject to a fine of up to $1,000; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business Regulation - Household Goods Movers - Registration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-23) (Y: 113 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {277770/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-06SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-04-04SenateHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-15SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (112-23)
2018-03-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {703894/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-02-20HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback