MD HB937 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Prince George's County Board of Education to develop curriculum content for a course in financial literacy as a part of the county board's high school curriculum; requiring the county board to implement specified curriculum content in high schools in Prince George's County beginning in the 2016-2017 school year; requiring specified students to complete a specified course in order to graduate from high school in Prince George's County beginning in the 2017-2018 school year; etc.
Title
Prince George's County - Financial Literacy Curriculum - Graduation Requirements PG 421-15
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-20 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Local Government Mandates
Prince George's County
Public Schools
Students
Education
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Local Government Mandates
Prince George's County
Public Schools
Students