MD HB936 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that an advanced practice registered nurse is not precluded from delegating a nursing or other technical task to an assistant under certain circumstances; and requiring the State Board of Nursing to adopt regulations to provide the manner in which an advanced practice registered nurse delegates a certain task, establish limitations on the authority of an advanced practice registered nurse, and provide other clarifications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Occupations – Advanced Practice Registered Nurses – Delegation of Tasks

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2020-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {606080/1 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-05HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health Occupations86A-02(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback