MD HB936 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that an advanced practice registered nurse is not precluded from delegating a nursing or other technical task to an assistant under certain circumstances; and requiring the State Board of Nursing to adopt regulations to provide the manner in which an advanced practice registered nurse delegates a certain task, establish limitations on the authority of an advanced practice registered nurse, and provide other clarifications.
Title
Health Occupations – Advanced Practice Registered Nurses – Delegation of Tasks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {606080/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education
Health Occupations
Job Training
Licenses
Nurses
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment
Education
Health Occupations
Job Training
Licenses
Nurses
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 8 | 6A-02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |