MD HB934 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a ticket reseller from selling or offering to sell speculative tickets unless the reseller makes certain disclosures; and requiring a reseller to refund a certain deposit or other consideration within 10 days after the event for which the tickets were sold under certain circumstances.
Title
Consumer Protection - Resale of Tickets - Disclosures and Refunds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {113397/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Dealers
Disclosure
Retail Sales
Time
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Dealers
Disclosure
Retail Sales
Time