MD HB932 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Comptroller to distribute the sales and use tax revenue from certain digital products to The Blueprint for Maryland's Future Fund; defining "digital product" as one that is obtained by the buyer or delivered electronically; applying the sales and use tax to a sale or use of certain digital products; providing that the retail sale of a certain digital code or digital product shall be presumed to be made in the state in which a certain customer tax address is located; stating the intent of the General Assembly; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

21st–Century Economy Fairness Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 89 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Floor Amendment 143328/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 87 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Floor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (Y: 53 N: 84 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-03-11 - House - Floor Amendment 603824/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (Y: 44 N: 93 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07HouseVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2020-03-18HousePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (89-45)
2020-03-18HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (30-15)
2020-03-17SenateFloor Amendment {143328/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-30)
2020-03-17SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFloor Amendment {143328/1 (Senator Hershey)
2020-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {599536/1 Adopted
2020-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-13SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (87-47)
2020-03-11HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-11HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (53-84)
2020-03-11HouseMotion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Love) Adopted
2020-03-11HouseFloor Amendment {453527/1 (Delegate Szeliga)
2020-03-11HouseFloor Amendment {603824/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (44-93)
2020-03-10HouseMotion Special Order until 3/11 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {755867/1 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SB1001 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-14 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education5219(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General11101(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General11102(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General11103(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General11217(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General11221(n/a)See Bill Text
Tax - General21302.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0932?ys=2020RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0932f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0932t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0932e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0932_75586701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0932_60382401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0932_45352701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0932_59953601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0932_14332801.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0444.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0445.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0523.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0903.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0904.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/1193.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback