MD HB928 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 373
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Public Service Commission to develop a training and educational program for certain licensed energy suppliers; requiring the Commission to develop the program in consultation with certain interested stakeholders, including electricity suppliers and gas suppliers;; requiring designated representatives to demonstrate a thorough understanding of certain Commission regulations; requiring the Commission to conduct an examination at the conclusion of training and provide certification on a satisfactory score; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Service Commission - Electricity and Gas Suppliers - Training and Educational Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 373
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-06SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2020-03-03HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-02HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB603 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 374

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities7311(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback