MD HB927 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Planning to provide a list of excess real property owned by the State to the Department of Housing and Community Development; requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to determine whether any of the listed properties are suitable for use or redevelopment as affordable housing; altering the contents of the Rental Housing Fund; requiring the Comptroller to distribute $30,000,000 of income tax revenue from individuals to the Rental Housing Fund on or before June 30, 2022; etc.
Title
Housing and Community Development - Affordable Housing - Excess Real Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-4) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {763829/1 Adopted |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-2) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {433122/1 Adopted |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB744 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Comptroller
Housing
Housing and Community Development
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Income Tax
Leases and Rent
Notices
Planning, Department of
Real Property
Reports
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Utilities
Comptroller
Housing
Housing and Community Development
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Income Tax
Leases and Rent
Notices
Planning, Department of
Real Property
Reports
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Utilities
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Housing and Community Development | 2 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 10 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 5 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 2 | 605.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |