MD HB927 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a gift basket permit in Baltimore County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore County to issue the permit to certain persons; providing that the permit authorizes a permit holder to sell and deliver gift baskets containing wine to consumers of a legal drinking age in the State; requiring a permit holder to maintain certain records and submit certain reports; limiting the value of the wine contained in a gift basket to 75% of the total value of the gift basket; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25HouseUnfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
2020-02-13HouseHearing canceled
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages131001.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages13102(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback