MD HB927 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a gift basket permit in Baltimore County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore County to issue the permit to certain persons; providing that the permit authorizes a permit holder to sell and deliver gift baskets containing wine to consumers of a legal drinking age in the State; requiring a permit holder to maintain certain records and submit certain reports; limiting the value of the wine contained in a gift basket to 75% of the total value of the gift basket; etc.
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Gift Basket Permit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2020-02-13 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Age of Majority
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore County
Commerce and Business
Fees
Gifts
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Prices
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore County
Commerce and Business
Fees
Gifts
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Prices
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 13 | 1001.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 13 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |