MD HB926 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an insurance policy of an obligor under a mechanical repair contract to provide certain coverage for contract nonperformance; and authorizing certain policies of insurance for mechanical repair contracts to be issued by certain certain risk retention groups.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts - Policies of Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 90 N: 34 NV: 9 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 586 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (90-34) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (31-14) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {923925/1 Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (105-30) |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB697 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 587
Subjects
Contracts
Ethics
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Repair
Revenue and Taxes
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Ethics
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Motor Vehicle Repair
Revenue and Taxes
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 15 | 311.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |