MD HB924 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1005
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-19 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-19 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a certain owner of a mobile home park to provide written notice of any increase in the annual rent for a site to a certain resident, a certain homeowners association, and the Division of Consumer Protection in the Office of the Attorney General at least 90 days before the effective date of the increase; authorizing an increase in annual rent to exceed an increase in a certain index only under certain circumstances; requiring a park owner to schedule a certain meeting and provide certain information; etc.
Title
Real Property - Mobile Home Parks - Rent Increases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-12 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-02 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB1005 (Carry Over) 2017-04-05 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Communications
Consumer Price Index
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Health
Housing
internet
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
meetings
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Notices
Prices
Public Information
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Signatures
Threats
Time
Communications
Consumer Price Index
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Health
Housing
internet
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
meetings
Mobile and Manufactured Homes
Notices
Prices
Public Information
Real Property
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Signatures
Threats
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 8A | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 8A | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |