MD HB924 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 372
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering certain geographic boundaries for a certain limitation to the issuance of a Class B-D-7 license in certain areas; prohibiting the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City from charging a fee for a temporary license permit extension under certain circumstances; requiring the Board to enforce certain provisions of law; authorizing the Board to waive certain distance restrictions for an application for the transfer of a license into a certain area under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – Distance Restrictions, Extension Fee, and Class D License

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 372
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {543394/1 Adopted
2020-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-06HouseHearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Alcoholic Beverages12102(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages121313(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages121603(n/a)See Bill Text
Alcoholic Beverages121605(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback