MD HB924 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Applying certain immunity from civil liability for certain acts or omissions to certain persons who administer to individuals who appear to be experiencing an opioid overdose a certain dose or certain doses of a certain opioid antidote.
Title
Emergency Medical Care - Administration of Opioid Antidotes - Immunity
Sponsors
Sen. William Folden [R] | Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D] | Del. Eric Bromwell [D] | Del. Carol Krimm [D] |
Del. C.T. Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2018-02-09 | House | Reassigned to Health and Government Operations and Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Civil Actions and Procedures
Drugs
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Good Samaritan
Law Enforcement
Liability
Public Health
Rescue Squads
Drugs
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Good Samaritan
Law Enforcement
Liability
Public Health
Rescue Squads