MD HB924 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Department of Natural Resources from reducing or altering the boundaries of specified oyster sanctuaries until the Department develops a fisheries management plan for the scientific management of the oyster stock following completion of a specified study and reports.
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Management - Prohibited Actions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-39) (Y: 102 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {843726/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (41-93) (Y: 41 N: 93 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {323328/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (46-89) (Y: 46 N: 89 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {503522/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (47-86) (Y: 47 N: 86 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {943529/1 (Delegate S. Howard) Rejected (49-86) (Y: 49 N: 86 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {993627/2 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-30) (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {853521/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-31) (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {793529/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (14-31) (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {843420/1 (Senator Mathias) Rejected (15-31) (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {503820/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-30) (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {933329/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-31) (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {843726/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (41-93) (Y: 41 N: 93 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {323328/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (46-89) (Y: 46 N: 89 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {503522/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (47-86) (Y: 47 N: 86 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {943529/1 (Delegate S. Howard) Rejected (49-86) (Y: 49 N: 86 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {993627/2 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-30) (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {853521/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-31) (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {793529/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (14-31) (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {843420/1 (Senator Mathias) Rejected (15-31) (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {503820/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-30) (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {933329/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-31) (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 27 |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {993627/2 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-30) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {853521/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-31) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {793529/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (14-31) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {843420/1 (Senator Mathias) Rejected (15-31) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {503820/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-30) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {933329/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-31) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Conway) Adopted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Miller) Adopted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-39) |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment {843726/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected (41-93) |
2017-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment {323328/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (46-89) |
2017-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment {503522/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (47-86) |
2017-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment {943529/1 (Delegate S. Howard) Rejected (49-86) |
2017-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment {923026/1 (Delegate Rey) Adopted |
2017-03-14 | House | Special Order until 03/15 (Delegate Rey) Adopted |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {960118/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Aquaculture
Boundaries
Chesapeake Bay
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Oysters
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Boundaries
Chesapeake Bay
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Oysters
Reports
State Universities and Colleges