MD HB920 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 623
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 623
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, a specified tax credit against the property tax imposed on a dwelling in Baltimore City that is newly purchased by a homeowner who has received the homestead property tax credit for a dwelling in Baltimore City under specified circumstances; requiring a homeowner to submit an application to the Director of the Department of Finance of Baltimore City to receive the credit; etc.
Title
Baltimore City Residential Retention Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 623 |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2014-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {749334/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {695761/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Baltimore City
Housing
Property Tax
Real Property
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Baltimore City
Housing
Property Tax
Real Property
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local